MI HB4540 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Assigned Pa 143'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sales tax; other; nexus of marketplace facilitators; clarify. Amends 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51 - 205.78) by adding sec. 2d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; other; nexus of marketplace facilitators; clarify. Amends 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51 - 205.78) by adding sec. 2d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 272 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-19HouseAssigned Pa 143'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-12-19HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/12/2019 03:00 Pm
2019-12-19HouseApproved By The Governor 12/12/2019 10:32 Am
2019-12-10HousePresented To The Governor 12/06/2019 09:45 Am
2019-12-04HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-12-04HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-12-04HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-12-04SenateInserted Full Title
2019-12-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-12-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-11-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-11-20SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-11-20SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-10-22SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2019-10-16HouseTransmitted
2019-10-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 272 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-10-16HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-16HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-10-16HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-16HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-10-16HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-08HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-08HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-06-19HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-05-07HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/07/2019
2019-05-02HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2019-05-02HouseRead A First Time
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Lynn Afendoulis

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4540
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4540.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4540.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4540.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0143.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4540.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-08-094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-16-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-11-20-110.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-04-112.htm

Bill Comments

feedback