MI HB4540 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 90'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 90'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; funding; sunsets on fees for wastewater and drinking water certifications and waste program facility and user charges; extend. Amends secs. 3110, 4104, 11135, 11153, 12109 & 12112 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3110 et seq.).
Title
Environmental protection; funding; sunsets on fees for wastewater and drinking water certifications and waste program facility and user charges; extend. Amends secs. 3110, 4104, 11135, 11153, 12109 & 12112 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3110 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Assigned Pa 90'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-08-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/12/2017 @ 1:16 Pm |
2017-08-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/12/2017 @ 11:53 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/29/2017 @ 2:54 Pm |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/22/2017 |
2017-07-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-07-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-05-31 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-05-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2017 |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |
Subjects
Environmental protection: funding
Environmental protection: hazardous waste
Environmental protection: sewage
Law: sunset
Transportation: other
Water: drinking water
Environmental protection: hazardous waste
Environmental protection: sewage
Law: sunset
Transportation: other
Water: drinking water