MI HB4524 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on August 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-25 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-25 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: railroads; local grade separation fund; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 11i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4523'21
Title
Transportation: railroads; local grade separation fund; create. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 11i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4523'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 435 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-08-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-08-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 435 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-08-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-08-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-08-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-03-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Darrin Camilleri |