MI HB4524 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Pa 28'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Pa 28'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; liability; joint and several liability; revise to reflect repeal of explosives act of 1970. Amends sec. 6312 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6312). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4523'17
Title
Torts; liability; joint and several liability; revise to reflect repeal of explosives act of 1970. Amends sec. 6312 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6312). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4523'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned Pa 28'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/21/2018 @ 2:48 Pm |
2018-02-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/20/2018 @ 12:17 Pm |
2018-02-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/9/2018 @ 11:02 Am |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 62 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-04-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |