MI HB4517 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-28 - Assigned Pa 164'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-28 - Assigned Pa 164'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; refunding bonds for bonded indebtedness of original school district involved in consolidation; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 863 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.863).
Title
Education; school districts; refunding bonds for bonded indebtedness of original school district involved in consolidation; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 863 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.863).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 414 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-28 | House | Assigned Pa 164'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-10-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/28/2015 @ 9:38 Am |
2015-10-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/28/2015 @ 9:01 Am |
2015-10-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/14/2015 @ 10:00 Am |
2015-10-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-10-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-10-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 414 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2015-06-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-06-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-05-21 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-04-28 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/24/2015 |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-04-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced By Representative David Rutledge |
Subjects
Education: financing
Education: reorganization
Education: school districts
State financing and management: bonds
Education: reorganization
Education: school districts
State financing and management: bonds