MI HB4516 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Assigned Pa 55'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Assigned Pa 55'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marihuana: liability; sale of marihuana to an individual who is younger than 21 years of age or visibly intoxicated; prohibit, and create cause of action for harm that the individual causes. Amends 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27951 - 333.27967) by adding sec. 11a.
Title
Marihuana: liability; sale of marihuana to an individual who is younger than 21 years of age or visibly intoxicated; prohibit, and create cause of action for harm that the individual causes. Amends 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27951 - 333.27967) by adding sec. 11a.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lilly [R] | Sen. Roger Hauck [R] | Rep. Yousef Rabhi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 391 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Assigned Pa 55'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-07-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/13/2021 04:34 Pm |
2021-07-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/13/2021 10:12 Am |
2021-06-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/30/2021 02:06 Pm |
2021-06-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-06-24 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 391 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-06-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-06-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-06-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |