MI HB4502 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 216'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 216'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; exemptions; certain self-insurer groups; exempt from taxation. Amends sec. 625 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.625).
Title
Corporate income tax; exemptions; certain self-insurer groups; exempt from taxation. Amends sec. 625 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.625).
Sponsors
Rep. James Lower [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 151 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 151 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 216'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2017 @ 3:12 Pm |
2017-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/19/2017 @ 8:16 Pm |
2017-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/18/2017 @ 11:24 Am |
2017-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-05-25 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Roll Call # 151 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2017-05-25 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-05-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-04-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced By Representative James Lower |