MI HB4500 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; scoring of offense variable 9; clarify that an embryo or fetus must be scored as a victim. Amends sec. 39, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.39).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; scoring of offense variable 9; clarify that an embryo or fetus must be scored as a victim. Amends sec. 39, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.39).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 Yeas 63 Nays 44 |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-04-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/20/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-04-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |