MI HB4499 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14)
Status: Passed on October 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-21 - Assigned Pa 153'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14)
Status: Passed on October 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-21 - Assigned Pa 153'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; civil actions; evidentiary standard to establish and abate a public nuisance; modify. Amends sec. 3815 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3815).
Title
Civil procedure; civil actions; evidentiary standard to establish and abate a public nuisance; modify. Amends sec. 3815 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.3815).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 219 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 219 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-21 | House | Assigned Pa 153'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-10-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/20/2015 @ 4:50 Pm |
2015-10-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/20/2015 @ 3:48 Pm |
2015-10-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/14/2015 @ 11:03 Am |
2015-10-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-10-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-10-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-06-04 | House | Transmitted |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 219 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2015-06-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-03 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-05-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-04-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/23/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Glenn |