MI HB4496 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-12)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 495'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-12)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 495'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; community colleges; granting of baccalaureate degrees in certain fields; allow. Amends secs. 105 & 121 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.105 & 389.121).
Title
Higher education; community colleges; granting of baccalaureate degrees in certain fields; allow. Amends secs. 105 & 121 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.105 & 389.121).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 863 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1036 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1036 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 67 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 495'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:34 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:56 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 2:32 Pm |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 863 Yeas 65 Nays 44 |
2012-12-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1036 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-23 | House | Rep. David Rutledge Tim Melton[*] Removed As Co-sponsor |
2011-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 67 Nays 43 |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-22 | House | Amended |
2011-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-04-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/25/2011 |
2011-03-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-03-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-24 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |
Same As/Similar To
SB0225 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Education