MI HB4495 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Assigned Pa 98'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Assigned Pa 98'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: medical services; general changes to the medical assistance program; provide for. Amends secs. 105d & 106 of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.105d & 400.106) & repeals secs. 105c & 105f of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.105c & 400.105f).
Title
Human services: medical services; general changes to the medical assistance program; provide for. Amends secs. 105d & 106 of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.105d & 400.106) & repeals secs. 105c & 105f of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.105c & 400.105f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 248 (Y: 81 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | House | Assigned Pa 98'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-07-19 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:54 Am |
2023-07-19 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/18/2023 11:58 Am |
2023-06-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/10/2023 11:12 Am |
2023-06-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-06-27 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 248 Yeas 81 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2023-06-27 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2023-06-27 | House | Rule Suspended |
2023-06-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2023-06-27 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2023-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 80 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2023-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-05-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2023 |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |