MI HB4495 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: individual licensing and registration; personal telephone numbers and email addresses of licensees and registrants under the skilled trades regulation act; prohibit the department of licensing and regulatory affairs from selling. Amends 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5101 - 339.6133) by adding sec. 218.
Title
Occupations: individual licensing and registration; personal telephone numbers and email addresses of licensees and registrants under the skilled trades regulation act; prohibit the department of licensing and regulatory affairs from selling. Amends 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5101 - 339.6133) by adding sec. 218.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 326 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 95 (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 95 (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-07-01 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/21/2022 10:36 Am |
2022-06-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 326 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-03-03 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 95 Yeas 99 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-02 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/11/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |
Subjects
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs