MI HB4493 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 170'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 170'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; curriculum; genocide education; provide for, and define teacher for purposes of teacher performance evaluation system. Amends secs. 1249, 1278 & 1279g of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1249 et seq.) & adds sec. 1168.
Title
Education; curriculum; genocide education; provide for, and define teacher for purposes of teacher performance evaluation system. Amends secs. 1249, 1278 & 1279g of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1249 et seq.) & adds sec. 1168.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 318 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Assigned Pa 170'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-07-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/14/2016 @ 10:18 Am |
2016-07-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/13/2016 @ 10:00 Am |
2016-06-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/31/2016 @ 11:56 Am |
2016-05-25 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-25 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-05-25 | House | Roll Call # 318 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-05-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-05-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-02-23 | House | Transmitted |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2016-02-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |