MI HB4486 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing; penalties for third degree and fourth degree child abuse; modify. Amends sec. 136b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.136b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing; penalties for third degree and fourth degree child abuse; modify. Amends sec. 136b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.136b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-01SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-01SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-02-13SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-02-08HouseTransmitted
2018-02-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 Yeas 100 Nays 9
2018-02-08HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-07HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-02-07HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-31HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-31HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-04-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2017
2017-04-19HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-04-19HouseRead A First Time
2017-04-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback