MI HB4477 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Assigned Pa 91'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Assigned Pa 91'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; appeals; service of papers; provide for alternate service if party is protected by a protective order. Amends secs. 227 & 316 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.227 & 600.316).
Title
Civil procedure; appeals; service of papers; provide for alternate service if party is protected by a protective order. Amends secs. 227 & 316 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.227 & 600.316).
Sponsors
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] | Rep. Robert Kosowski [D] | Rep. John Kivela [D] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] |
Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Pam Faris [D] | Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] |
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Assigned Pa 91'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-04-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/26/2016 @ 1:08 Pm |
2016-04-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/26/2016 @ 9:55 Am |
2016-04-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/19/2016 @ 1:44 Pm |
2016-04-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-04-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-04-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-15 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 104 Nays 1 |
2015-10-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-10-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-10-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-10-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-10-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |
Same As/Similar To
SB0254 (Same As) 2015-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary