MI HB4474 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: assaultive; reference to vulnerable adult chapter of the Michigan penal code in the mental health code; modify to reflect addition of elder adults. Amends sec. 134a of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1134a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4473'21
Title
Crimes: assaultive; reference to vulnerable adult chapter of the Michigan penal code in the mental health code; modify to reflect addition of elder adults. Amends sec. 134a of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1134a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4473'21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Rodney Wakeman |