MI HB4473 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: assaultive; assaulting elder or vulnerable adults; modify certain penalties. Amends heading of ch. XXA of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 145s. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4260'21
Title
Crimes: assaultive; assaulting elder or vulnerable adults; modify certain penalties. Amends heading of ch. XXA of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 145s. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4260'21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Douglas Wozniak |