MI HB4472 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Assigned Pa 41'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Assigned Pa 41'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; food and drug administration-designated interchangeable biological drug products; allow pharmacists to dispense under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 17702, 17704 & 17755 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17702 et seq.).
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; food and drug administration-designated interchangeable biological drug products; allow pharmacists to dispense under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 17702, 17704 & 17755 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17702 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. John Bizon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 93 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Assigned Pa 41'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/28/2018 @ 4:30 Pm |
2018-03-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/28/2018 @ 8:46 Am |
2018-02-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/21/2018 @ 4:00 Pm |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 93 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-01-25 | House | Transmitted |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Amended |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2018-01-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |
Subjects
Health occupations: pharmacists
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs