MI HB4464 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Re-referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Re-referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Children; child care; child care centers, group child care homes, and family child care homes to provide rules regarding safe sleep to certain parents; require. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 3h.
Title
Children; child care; child care centers, group child care homes, and family child care homes to provide rules regarding safe sleep to certain parents; require. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 3h.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Schor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Andy Schor |
Subjects
Children: child care
Children: health
Health: children
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Children: health
Health: children
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs