MI HB4461 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 250'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 250'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection: solid waste; materials management planning; revise. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding subpt. 11 to pt. 115.
Title
Environmental protection: solid waste; materials management planning; revise. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding subpt. 11 to pt. 115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 (Y: 78 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 250'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 03:56 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2022 02:10 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:40 Am |
2022-12-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 505 Yeas 82 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 524 Yeas 26 Nays 6 Excused 6 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-22 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 138 Yeas 78 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Joe Tate |