MI HB4458 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; licensing; penalty for failure to comply with certain licensing requirements; modify. Amends sec. 227 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.227).
Title
Weapons; licensing; penalty for failure to comply with certain licensing requirements; modify. Amends sec. 227 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.227).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2017-09-27 | House | Transmitted |
2017-09-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 Yeas 82 Nays 26 |
2017-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Shane Hernandez |