MI HB4457 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 246'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 246'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection: solid waste; financial assurance provisions; revise. Amends secs. 11523, 11523a, 11523b, 11525, 11525a & 11525b of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11523 et seq.); designates secs. 11523 - 11525f as subpt. 4 of pt. 115 & adds secs. 11525d & 11525f.
Title
Environmental protection: solid waste; financial assurance provisions; revise. Amends secs. 11523, 11523a, 11523b, 11525, 11525a & 11525b of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11523 et seq.); designates secs. 11523 - 11525f as subpt. 4 of pt. 115 & adds secs. 11525d & 11525f.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 (Y: 88 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 246'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 03:48 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2022 02:02 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:32 Am |
2022-12-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 520 Yeas 28 Nays 4 Excused 6 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-22 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 Yeas 88 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Yousef Rabhi |