MI HB4457 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 133'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 133'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; other; certain forms of energy improvement financing for community colleges; provide for. Amends sec. 122 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.122).
Title
State financing and management; other; certain forms of energy improvement financing for community colleges; provide for. Amends sec. 122 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.122).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | House | Assigned Pa 133'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-10-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/26/2017 @ 2:18 Pm |
2017-10-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/26/2017 @ 12:05 Pm |
2017-10-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/19/2017 @ 1:43 Pm |
2017-10-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-10-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2017-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |
Subjects
Energy: conservation and efficiency
Higher education: community colleges
State financing and management: other
Higher education: community colleges
State financing and management: other