MI HB4456 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 245'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 245'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection: solid waste; disposal areas and waste diversion centers; revise regulation of. Amends secs. 11509, 11510, 11511, 11511a, 11511b, 11512, 11513, 11514, 11514b, 11515, 11516, 11517, 11518, 11519, 11519b, 11520 & 11521b of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11509 et seq.); designates secs. 11509 - 11520 as subpt. 2 & sec. 11521b as subpt. 3 of pt. 115; adds secs. 11512b, 11512d, 11512f & 11512h & repeals secs. 11521 & 11522 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11521 & 324.11522).
Title
Environmental protection: solid waste; disposal areas and waste diversion centers; revise regulation of. Amends secs. 11509, 11510, 11511, 11511a, 11511b, 11512, 11513, 11514, 11514b, 11515, 11516, 11517, 11518, 11519, 11519b, 11520 & 11521b of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11509 et seq.); designates secs. 11509 - 11520 as subpt. 2 & sec. 11521b as subpt. 3 of pt. 115; adds secs. 11512b, 11512d, 11512f & 11512h & repeals secs. 11521 & 11522 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11521 & 324.11522).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 133 (Y: 86 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 245'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 03:46 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2022 02:00 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:30 Am |
2022-12-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-08 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 501 Yeas 81 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-08 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Title Amended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 519 Yeas 27 Nays 5 Excused 6 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-22 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 133 Yeas 86 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative William Sowerby |