MI HB4451 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-12-04 - Presented To The Governor 11/25/2019 03:01 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; health insurers; coverage and benefits prescription eye drops; provide for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406u.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; health insurers; coverage and benefits prescription eye drops; provide for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406u.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-04HousePresented To The Governor 11/25/2019 03:01 Pm
2019-11-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-11-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-11-20HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-11-13SenateInserted Full Title
2019-11-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-11-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-11-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-10-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-10-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-06-20SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted
2019-06-19HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-06-19HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-18HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-18HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-06-18HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-04HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-05-16HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-04-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/17/2019
2019-04-11HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-04-11HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Calley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4451
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4451.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4451.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4451.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4451.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-04-056.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-19-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-29-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-11-13-109.htm

Bill Comments

feedback