MI HB4449 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses: limited liability companies; annual statement fees, late fee penalty, and fee for electronic submission; eliminate. Amends secs. 909 & 1101 of 1993 PA 23 (MCL 450.4909 & 450.5101).
Title
Businesses: limited liability companies; annual statement fees, late fee penalty, and fee for electronic submission; eliminate. Amends secs. 909 & 1101 of 1993 PA 23 (MCL 450.4909 & 450.5101).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 (Y: 60 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-10-19 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 Yeas 60 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-10-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Ryan Berman |