MI HB4445 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Assigned Pa 29'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Assigned Pa 29'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: licenses; minimum number of sporting events for a motor sports license; reduce. Amends sec. 518 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1518).
Title
Liquor: licenses; minimum number of sporting events for a motor sports license; reduce. Amends sec. 518 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1518).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 251 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Assigned Pa 29'21 |
2021-06-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/15/2021 02:24 Pm |
2021-06-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/15/2021 01:06 Pm |
2021-06-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/08/2021 09:16 Am |
2021-06-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-03 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-06-03 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 251 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Lightner |