MI HB4443 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: credits; distributor credit for returnable containers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding secs. 279 & 679.
Title
Corporate income tax: credits; distributor credit for returnable containers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding secs. 279 & 679.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 (Y: 88 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 (Y: 88 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 Yeas 88 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |