MI HB4443 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Assigned Pa 106'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Juveniles; criminal procedure; age of offender for specified juvenile violations; modify in code of criminal procedure. Amends sec. 1f, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.1f). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4452'19, SB 0100'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles; criminal procedure; age of offender for specified juvenile violations; modify in code of criminal procedure. Amends sec. 1f, ch. IV of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 764.1f). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4452'19, SB 0100'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 67 (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06HouseAssigned Pa 106'19
2019-11-06HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/31/2019 01:58 Pm
2019-11-06HouseApproved By The Governor 10/31/2019 09:32 Am
2019-10-23HousePresented To The Governor 10/21/2019 02:35 Pm
2019-10-16HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-10-16HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-10-16HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 278 Yeas 103 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-10-16HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-10-16HouseRule Suspended
2019-10-16HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-10-16HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
2019-10-16SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2019-10-16SenateInserted Full Title
2019-10-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 257 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-10-16SenateRules Suspended
2019-10-16SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-10-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-16SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-10-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-10-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-10-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-15SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-04-30SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-04-25HouseTransmitted
2019-04-25HousePassed Roll Call # 67 Yeas 103 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-25HouseRead A Third Time
2019-04-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-04-24HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-04-24HouseRead A Second Time
2019-04-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-04-16HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-04-11HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2019
2019-04-10HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-04-10HouseRead A First Time
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4443
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4443.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4443.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4443.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4443.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0106.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-16-034.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-25-039.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-15-096.htm

Bill Comments

feedback