MI HB4438 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 271'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 271'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; sewage; exemption from domestic septage law; provide for portable toilets for farm laborers. Amends secs. 11701 & 11718 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11701 & 324.11718) & adds sec. 11721.
Title
Environmental protection; sewage; exemption from domestic septage law; provide for portable toilets for farm laborers. Amends secs. 11701 & 11718 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11701 & 324.11718) & adds sec. 11721.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 536 (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 82 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 (Y: 82 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 271'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/29/2018 @ 9:14 Am |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/28/2018 @ 2:51 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/20/2018 @ 1:48 Pm |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | House | Roll Call # 536 Yeas 80 Nays 29 |
2018-06-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-06-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 415 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 243 Yeas 82 Nays 25 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Amended |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |
Subjects
Agriculture: other
Environmental protection: sewage
Labor: agricultural
State agencies (existing): agriculture and rural development
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
Environmental protection: sewage
Labor: agricultural
State agencies (existing): agriculture and rural development
State agencies (existing): environmental quality