MI HB4434 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security: administration; plain language; require the unemployment agency to use in communications and determinations. Amends secs. 2, 11 & 32b of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.2 et seq.) & adds sec. 32e.
Title
Employment security: administration; plain language; require the unemployment agency to use in communications and determinations. Amends secs. 2, 11 & 32b of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.2 et seq.) & adds sec. 32e.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 394 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 390 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 320 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 390 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 320 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 (Y: 60 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-07-21 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 07/20/2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/06/2021 02:43 Pm |
2021-06-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 394 Yeas 59 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-06-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-24 | House | Vote On Concurring Reconsidered |
2021-06-24 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2021-06-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-06-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 390 Yeas 57 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-06-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-06-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-06-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 320 Yeas 19 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-17 | House | Rep. Regina Weiss Removed As Cosponsor |
2021-06-17 | House | Rep. Kyra Bolden Removed As Cosponsor |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Tim Sneller, Donna Lasinski, Tyrone Carter Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Jewell Jones, Brenda Carter, William Sowerby Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Felicia Brabec, Joe Tate, John Cherry Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Tullio Liberati, Darrin Camilleri, Ranjeev Puri Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Yousef Rabhi, Abraham Aiyash, Stephanie Young Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Samantha Steckloff, Cara Clemente, Amos O'neal Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Alex Garza, Mary Cavanagh, Shri Thanedar Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Julie Brixie, Terry Sabo, Nate Shannon Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Helena Scott, Kevin Coleman, Karen Whitsett Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps.rachel Hood, Jim Ellison, Tenisha Yancey Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Kara Hope, Padma Kuppa, Matt Koleszar Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Reps. Laurie Pohutsky, Mari Manoogian, Kelly Breen Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-06-17 | House | Rep. Lori Stone Removed As Sponsor |
2021-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 350 Yeas 60 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-17 | House | Amended |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-17 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2021-06-17 | House | Rep. Richard Steenland Removed As Cosponsor |
2021-06-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent |
2021-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Lori Stone |