MI HB4431 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Assigned Pa 92'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Assigned Pa 92'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: bingo and charitable gaming; definition of occasion; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.103).
Title
Gaming: bingo and charitable gaming; definition of occasion; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.103).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 465 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Assigned Pa 92'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/29/2021 11:48 Am |
2021-11-02 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/29/2021 10:05 Am |
2021-10-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/19/2021 11:48 Am |
2021-10-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-13 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 465 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-10-13 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2021-09-29 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-09-29 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-19 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Hertel |