MI HB4425 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-27 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-27 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: political parties; state political party to change name to affiliated national political party; allow. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding sec. 685a.
Title
Elections: political parties; state political party to change name to affiliated national political party; allow. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding sec. 685a.
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 423 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-07-21 | House | Transmitted |
2021-07-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 423 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-07-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-07-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-07-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-07-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-07-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Phil Green |