MI HB4423 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: other; definition of qualified city; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2003 PA 258 (MCL 124.753).
Title
Economic development: other; definition of qualified city; modify. Amends sec. 3 of 2003 PA 258 (MCL 124.753).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/04/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |