MI HB4423 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; funds; sheriff patrol assistance to distressed counties grants; establish. Creates new act.
Title
Law enforcement; funds; sheriff patrol assistance to distressed counties grants; establish. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. James Lower [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/28/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-03-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced By Representative James Lower |
Subjects
Counties: financing
Counties: other
Law enforcement: funds
Law enforcement: local police
State agencies (existing): state police
Counties: other
Law enforcement: funds
Law enforcement: local police
State agencies (existing): state police