MI HB4420 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: zero budget; multi-department supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: zero budget; multi-department supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 208 (Y: 65 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-05-13HouseTransmitted
2021-05-13HouseTitle Amended
2021-05-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 208 Yeas 65 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2021-05-13HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-05-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-13HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted And Amended
2021-05-13HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2021-05-13HouseRead A Second Time
2021-04-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-04-29HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2021-03-03HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021
2021-03-02HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-03-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Thomas Albert

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4420
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4420.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4420.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4420-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4420-0O409.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4420-67722D90.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4420-4796344D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4420-B351C384.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4420-2756571E.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-29-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-13-043.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback