MI HB4414 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 214'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on October 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-13 - Assigned Pa 214'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health: other; mental health transport for involuntary psych hospitalization; create standards and licensing requirements for. Amends secs. 100d, 281c, 282, 408, 409, 426, 427a, 429, 436, 438, 469a, 498k, 498t, 516, 519 & 537 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100d et seq.) & adds secs. 170 & 172.
Title
Mental health: other; mental health transport for involuntary psych hospitalization; create standards and licensing requirements for. Amends secs. 100d, 281c, 282, 408, 409, 426, 427a, 429, 436, 438, 469a, 498k, 498t, 516, 519 & 537 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100d et seq.) & adds secs. 170 & 172.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 (Y: 79 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 (Y: 79 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Assigned Pa 214'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-10-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2022 01:00 Pm |
2022-10-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/14/2022 11:46 Am |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/05/2022 12:29 Pm |
2022-09-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-09-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-09-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Title Amended |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 Yeas 79 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2022-09-21 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |