MI HB4412 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Assigned Pa 123'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Assigned Pa 123'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; sale or purchase of dextromethorphan for individuals under the age of 18; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 17766g.
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; sale or purchase of dextromethorphan for individuals under the age of 18; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 17766g.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 300 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 104 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 104 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Assigned Pa 123'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-11-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/15/2019 09:32 Am |
2019-11-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/14/2019 01:59 Pm |
2019-11-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/08/2019 10:38 Am |
2019-10-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-11-05 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 300 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-11-05 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-10-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2019-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 104 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-05-23 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-05-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-04-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/09/2019 |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-03-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |