MI HB4410 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Assigned Pa 10'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: capital outlay; higher education; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: capital outlay; higher education; provide for fiscal year 2021-2022. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 34 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 20 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 33 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 395 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16HouseAssigned Pa 10'22 With Immediate Effect
2022-02-16HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 02/16/2022 10:58 Am
2022-02-16HouseApproved By The Governor 02/16/2022 09:32 Am
2022-02-15HousePresented To The Governor 02/15/2022 11:34 Am
2022-02-09HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2022-02-09HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 34 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2022-02-09HouseSenate Amendment(s) To House Substitute (h-4) Concurred In
2022-02-09HouseRule Suspended
2022-02-09HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2022-02-09HouseRe-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Substitute (h-4)
2022-02-09SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2022-02-09SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 20 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2022-02-09SenateHouse Substitute (h-4) To Senate Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
2022-02-09SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2022-02-09SenateReturned From House With Substitute (h-4) To Senate Substitute (s-1)
2022-02-08HouseRetransmitted
2022-02-08HouseTitle Amended
2022-02-08HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 33 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2022-02-08HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In As Substituted (h-4)
2022-02-08HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted
2022-02-08HousePlaced On Messages From The Senate
2022-02-08HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2022-02-08HouseRule Suspended
2021-10-26HouseRe-referred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-06-30HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-06-30HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2021-06-30SenateTitle Amended
2021-06-30SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2021-06-30SenateVote Reconsidered
2021-06-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 322 Yeas 32 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 2
2021-06-30SenatePostponed Temporarily
2021-06-30SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-30SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
2021-06-30SenateSubstitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
2021-06-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
2021-06-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-06-30SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-24HouseTransmitted
2021-06-24HouseTitle Amended
2021-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 395 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-24HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended
2021-06-24HouseRead A Second Time
2021-06-24HousePlaced On Second Reading
2021-06-24HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2021-06-24HouseRule Suspended
2021-03-03HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021
2021-03-02HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-03-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Thomas Albert

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4410
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4410.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2022-PA-0010.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4410-0O409.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4410-0C1020.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4410-0O3337.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4410-D3437AB0.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4410-C1602F2D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4410-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4410-C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4410-F553B9E6.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4410-55045210.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4410-22517EE1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4410-5782B260.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-24-061.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-30-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-02-08-011.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-02-09-012.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-02-09-012.htm

Bill Comments

feedback