MI HB4403 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 253'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 253'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; medical services; acute treatment services and clinical stabilization services for opioid addiction as a covered medical service; allow. Amends sec. 109 of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.109).
Title
Human services; medical services; acute treatment services and clinical stabilization services for opioid addiction as a covered medical service; allow. Amends sec. 109 of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.109).
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Schor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 201 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 201 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 253'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2017 @ 2:30 Pm |
2017-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2017 @ 12:16 Pm |
2017-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/18/2017 @ 11:16 Am |
2017-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 531 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 201 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2017-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Andy Schor |
Subjects
Health: controlled substances
Health: substance use disorder treatment
Human services: medical services
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: substance use disorder treatment
Human services: medical services
State agencies (existing): health and human services