MI HB4397 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Assigned Pa 22'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; no-fault; coverage and benefits; make miscellaneous changes. Amends secs. 3009, 3109a, 3111, 3116, 3135 & 3151 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3009 et seq.) & adds secs. 2111f, 3107c & 3107d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; no-fault; coverage and benefits; make miscellaneous changes. Amends secs. 3009, 3109a, 3111, 3116, 3135 & 3151 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3009 et seq.) & adds secs. 2111f, 3107c & 3107d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 107 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 125 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 84 (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseAssigned Pa 22'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-11HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 06/11/2019 03:24 Pm
2019-06-11HouseApproved By The Governor 06/11/2019 02:24 Pm
2019-06-06HousePresented To The Governor 06/06/2019 09:26 Am
2019-06-04HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-04HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2019-06-04HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 107 Yeas 89 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-06-04HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-06-04HouseRule Suspended
2019-06-04HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-06-04HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2019-06-04SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-04SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 125 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2019-06-04SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-04SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-04SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-06-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-05-09SenateRules Suspended
2019-05-09HouseTransmitted
2019-05-09HouseTitle Amended
2019-05-09HousePassed Roll Call # 84 Yeas 61 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-05-09HouseRead A Third Time
2019-05-09HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-05-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-08HouseAmendment(s) Not Adopted
2019-05-08HouseAmendment(s) Reconsidered
2019-05-08HousePostponed For The Day
2019-05-08HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended
2019-05-08HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-08HousePlaced On Second Reading
2019-05-08HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2019-05-08HouseRule Suspended
2019-03-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2019
2019-03-19HouseReferred To Committee On Insurance
2019-03-19HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Jason Sheppard

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4397
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4397.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4397.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4397.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4397.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-09-045.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-04-056.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-06-04-056.htm

Bill Comments

feedback