MI HB4396 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Assigned Pa 149'17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax; deductions; certain pension income for certain individuals; modify. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax; deductions; certain pension income for certain individuals; modify. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 228 (Y: 94 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-02HouseAssigned Pa 149'17
2017-11-02HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/2/2017 @ 1:32 Pm
2017-11-02HouseApproved By The Governor 11/2/2017 @ 11:24 Am
2017-10-24HousePresented To The Governor 10/19/2017 @ 1:41 Pm
2017-10-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2017-10-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2017-10-17HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2017-10-17SenateInserted Full Title
2017-10-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2017-10-17SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2017-10-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-10-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-09-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-09-26SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-09-26SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-06-21SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2017-06-20HouseTransmitted
2017-06-20HousePassed Roll Call # 228 Yeas 94 Nays 12
2017-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-13HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-06-13HouseRead A Second Time
2017-06-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-03-23HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2017
2017-03-22HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2017-03-22HouseRead A First Time
2017-03-22HouseIntroduced By Representative Joseph Bellino

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4396
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4396.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0149.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-07-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-20-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-26-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-17-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback