MI HB4390 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 133'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 133'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; fire personnel; use of firefighting foam containing certain substances; prohibit in firefighter training, and require certain training on use. Amends secs. 2 & 9 of 1966 PA 291 (MCL 29.362 & 29.369) & adds sec. 9c.
Title
Law enforcement; fire personnel; use of firefighting foam containing certain substances; prohibit in firefighter training, and require certain training on use. Amends secs. 2 & 9 of 1966 PA 291 (MCL 29.362 & 29.369) & adds sec. 9c.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Yousef Rabhi [D] | Rep. Tommy Brann [R] | Sen. Kevin Hertel [D] |
Rep. William Sowerby [D] | Rep. Sue Allor [R] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 237 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 133'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2020 12:16 Pm |
2020-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/08/2020 10:20 Am |
2020-07-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/30/2020 01:34 Pm |
2020-07-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/25/2020 |
2020-07-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-07-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 237 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Environmental Quality |
2019-10-03 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-10-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-03-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-03-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |
Subjects
Environmental protection: hazardous products
Law enforcement: fire personnel
Law enforcement: training
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Law enforcement: fire personnel
Law enforcement: training
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs