MI HB4389 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 132'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 132'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; hazardous products; firefighting foam containing PFAS; require reports on use of and require department of environmental quality to accept for disposal. Amends heading of subpt. 1 of pt. 147 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) & adds secs. 14701, 14703 & 14705.
Title
Environmental protection; hazardous products; firefighting foam containing PFAS; require reports on use of and require department of environmental quality to accept for disposal. Amends heading of subpt. 1 of pt. 147 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) & adds secs. 14701, 14703 & 14705.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 256 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 249 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 249 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 132'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2020 12:14 Pm |
2020-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/08/2020 10:18 Am |
2020-07-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/25/2020 12:00 Pm |
2020-06-23 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-23 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-06-23 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 256 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-06-23 | House | Senate Substitute (s-5) Concurred In |
2020-06-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-5) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-5) Adopted |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4) As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-4) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4) And Amendment(s) |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Environmental Quality |
2019-10-03 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 249 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-10-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-03-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-03-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Sue Allor |