MI HB4388 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on November 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-10 - Assigned Pa 319'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on November 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-10 - Assigned Pa 319'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; financing; school district's permissible use of sinking funds; expand to include school security improvements and technology. Amends sec. 1212 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1212).
Title
Education; financing; school district's permissible use of sinking funds; expand to include school security improvements and technology. Amends sec. 1212 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1212).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 569 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | House | Assigned Pa 319'16 |
2016-11-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/9/2016 @ 1:52 Pm |
2016-11-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/9/2016 @ 12:01 Pm |
2016-11-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/1/2016 @ 11:30 Am |
2016-11-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/20/2016 |
2016-11-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-11-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 569 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-06-08 | House | Transmitted |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-06-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-06-07 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2016-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2015-10-22 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2015-10-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-03-26 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2015-03-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |