MI HB4386 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: other; governor's office; subject to freedom of information act and designate separate part of act. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 10, 10a & 10b of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 et seq.) & designates secs. 1 - 16 as pt. 1. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4383'21
Title
Civil rights: other; governor's office; subject to freedom of information act and designate separate part of act. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 10, 10a & 10b of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 et seq.) & designates secs. 1 - 16 as pt. 1. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4383'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-03-18 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |
Subjects
Civil rights: open meetings
Civil rights: other
Legislature: other
State agencies (existing): executive office
Civil rights: other
Legislature: other
State agencies (existing): executive office