MI HB4383 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: other; legislative open records act (LORA); create as part of the freedom of information act. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding pt. 2. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4392'21, HB 4389'21, HB 4385'21, HB 4391'21, HB 4388'21, HB 4387'21, HB 4384'21, HB 4390'21, HB 4386'21
Title
Civil rights: other; legislative open records act (LORA); create as part of the freedom of information act. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding pt. 2. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4392'21, HB 4389'21, HB 4385'21, HB 4391'21, HB 4388'21, HB 4387'21, HB 4384'21, HB 4390'21, HB 4386'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 57 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-03-18 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 57 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Ryan Berman |