MI HB4368 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: school districts; requirement for the allocation of funding toward joint hearing related to certain waiver requests; remove. Repeals sec. 160 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1760).
Title
Education: school districts; requirement for the allocation of funding toward joint hearing related to certain waiver requests; remove. Repeals sec. 160 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1760).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |