MI HB4366 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Assigned Pa 106'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Assigned Pa 106'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in enhanced driver license, and provide for law enforcement access. Amends sec. 5 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.305).
Title
Traffic control: driver license; designation as an individual with a communication impediment; allow in enhanced driver license, and provide for law enforcement access. Amends sec. 5 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.305).
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Lilly [R] | Rep. Tim Sneller [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 346 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 346 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | House | Assigned Pa 106'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/04/2021 02:54 Pm |
2021-11-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/04/2021 09:46 Am |
2021-11-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/03/2021 01:50 Pm |
2021-10-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 346 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/25/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-02-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Lilly |
Subjects
Disabilities: other
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
Traffic control: driver license
Law enforcement: law enforcement information network (LEIN)
State agencies (existing): state
State agencies (existing): state police
Traffic control: driver license