MI HB4365 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Assigned Pa 105'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Assigned Pa 105'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State: identification cards; communication impediment designation requirements for state identification cards; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.291).
Title
State: identification cards; communication impediment designation requirements for state identification cards; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.291).
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Sneller [D] | Rep. Jim Lilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 494 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | House | Assigned Pa 105'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/04/2021 02:52 Pm |
2021-11-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/04/2021 09:44 Am |
2021-11-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/03/2021 01:48 Pm |
2021-10-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-26 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 494 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-10-26 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-10-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-10-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-06-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 345 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended |
2021-06-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/25/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-02-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Sneller |
Subjects
Disabilities: other
Health occupations: audiologists
Health occupations: psychologists
Health occupations: speech-language pathologists
State agencies (existing): state
State: identification cards
Health occupations: audiologists
Health occupations: psychologists
Health occupations: speech-language pathologists
State agencies (existing): state
State: identification cards